Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Kwaku Atuahene

Bishop of Goaso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1956 BornBrosankro
12 Jul 198629.8Ordained PriestPriest of Sunyani, Ghana
24 Oct 199741.1AppointedBishop of Goaso, Ghana
6 Jan 199841.3Ordained BishopBishop of Goaso, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Peter Kwaku Atuahene:
Bishop Peter Kwaku Atuahene (born ) Bishop of Goaso

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Goaso.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013