Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Redrado Marchite, O.H.

Secretary Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers

Titular Bishop of Aufinium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1936 BornFustińana, Spain
11 Jul 196529.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Hospitallers of Saint John of God
5 Dec 199862.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Aufinium
5 Dec 199862.7AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers
6 Jan 199962.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aufinium
14 Jul 201175.3RetiredSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers

MicroData Summary for José Luis Redrado Marchite:
Bishop José Luis Redrado Marchite O.H. (born ) Secretary Emeritus of Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers

Please contact the Bishop through the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,462
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013