Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Franciszek Cardinal Macharski

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kraków {Cracow}

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1927BornKraków
2 Apr 195022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
29 Dec 197851.6AppointedArchbishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
6 Jan 197951.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
28 Jan 197951.6InstalledArchbishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
30 Jun 197952.1Elevated to Cardinal
30 Jun 197952.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
11 Nov 197952.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
3 Jun 200578.0RetiredArchbishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
2 Aug 201689.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Macharski (VIAF: 89080081)
Franciszek Cardinal Macharski (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kraków {Cracow}

  • a priest for 66.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
  • a cardinal for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 63*
  • d: CB, 2 Aug 2016
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Oct 2016