Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giulio Antonio Cardinal Santorio

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1532Born
1557²24.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 156633.7AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
12 Mar 156633.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
17 May 157037.9Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jun 157038.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
9 Jan 157340.5ResignedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
8 Feb 159259.6AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
20 Feb 159562.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
18 Aug 159765.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
9 May 160269.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Santa Severina, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Antonio Santorio (VIAF: 88833583)
Giulio Antonio Cardinal Santorio (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceErcole, Diocese of Caserta, Italy
Ordained BishopPauline, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Saint Mary Major, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.1 years
  • a cardinal for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1570
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 298
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 8, Number 10
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1566, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast