Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Erwin Josef Ender

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Germany

Titular Archbishop of Germania in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1937 BornSteingrund
10 Oct 196528.0Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
15 Mar 199052.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Germania in Numidia
15 Mar 199052.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Sudan
5 Apr 199052.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Germania in Numidia
26 Mar 199254.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Somalia
9 Jul 199759.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lithuania
9 Jul 199759.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Estonia
9 Jul 199759.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Latvia
9 Aug 199759.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Estonia
19 May 200163.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Czech Republic
25 Nov 200366.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
15 Oct 200770.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany

MicroData Summary for Erwin Josef Ender (VIAF: 74382865)
Archbishop Erwin Josef Ender (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Germany

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Germany.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2007
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,785
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 2 Dec 2016