Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sergio Goretti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Assisi-Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1929BornCittą di Castello
5 Apr 195324.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 198051.7AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
14 Dec 198051.7AppointedBishop of Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino, Italy
6 Jan 198151.8Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
30 Sep 198657.5AppointedBishop of Assisi-Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino, Italy
19 Nov 200576.6RetiredBishop of Assisi-Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino, Italy
22 Jun 201283.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Assisi-Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sergio Goretti:
Bishop Sergio Goretti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Assisi-Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2005
  • d: CB, 22 Jun 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013