Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislaw Smolenski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kraków {Cracow}

Titular Bishop of Alava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1915BornWien
24 Oct 193722.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
14 Jan 197054.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
14 Jan 197054.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Alava
5 Apr 197054.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alava
1 Feb 199276.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
8 Aug 200691.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanislaw Smolenski:
Bishop Stanislaw Smolenski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kraków {Cracow}

  • a priest for 68.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,822
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013