Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ján Babjak, S.J.

Archbishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1953 BornHažine nad Cirichou
11 Jun 197824.6Ordained PriestPriest of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
18 Jun 198733.6IncardinatedPriest of Society of Jesus
11 Dec 200249.1AppointedBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
6 Jan 200349.2Ordained BishopBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
18 Jan 200349.2InstalledBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
30 Jan 200854.3AppointedArchbishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
17 Feb 200854.3InstalledArchbishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Ján Babjak:
Archbishop Ján Babjak S.J. (born ) Archbishop of Prešov (Prjašev)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,307

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013