Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bruno Bertagna

Deceased

Vice President Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts

Titular Archbishop of Drivastum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1935BornTiedoli di Borgo Val di Taro, Italy
23 May 195923.6Ordained PriestPriest
1989²53.2AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
6 Apr 199054.4AppointedSecretary General of the Governatorate of Vatican City State
15 Dec 199055.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Drivastum
6 Jan 199155.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Drivastum
18 Jun 199458.6AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
18 Jun 199458.6CeasedSecretary General of the Governatorate of Vatican City State
19 Dec 199459.1AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for the Interpretation of Legislative Texts
15 Feb 200771.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Drivastum
15 Feb 200771.3AppointedVice President of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts
12 Oct 201075.0RetiredVice President of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts
31 Oct 201378.0DiedVice President Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bruno Bertagna
Archbishop Bruno Bertagna (born , died ) Vice President Emeritus of Legislative Texts

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2007
  • r: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,307
  • d: CB, 31 Oct 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Jun 2016