Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignazio Bedini, S.D.B.

Archbishop Emeritus of Ispahan, Iran


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1939 Born
15 Aug 195819.1ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
21 Dec 196829.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
2 Dec 198950.4AppointedArchbishop of Ispahan, Iran
6 Jan 199050.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ispahan, Iran
16 Feb 199050.6InstalledArchbishop of Ispahan, Iran
20 Jan 201575.5RetiredArchbishop of Ispahan, Iran

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Bedini
Archbishop Ignazio Bedini S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ispahan

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrignano sulla Secchia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ispahan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,677
  • prof/c1/i: CB, 31 Dec 2014
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast