Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leon Augustine Tharmaraj

Deceased

Bishop of Kottar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1941BornKovalam
29 Mar 196523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kottar, India
14 Nov 198847.5AppointedBishop of Kottar, India
6 Jan 198947.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kottar, India
16 Jan 200765.7DiedBishop of Kottar, India

MicroData Summary for Leon Augustine Tharmaraj:
Bishop Leon Augustine Tharmaraj (born , died ) Bishop of Kottar

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,026
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015