Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Leo XII

Annibale Francesco Clemente Melchiore Girolamo Nicola della Genga

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1760BornMonticelli di Genga
1783²22.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Jun 178322.8Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 179433.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
24 Feb 179433.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
23 Apr 179433.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
1800²39.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
8 Mar 181655.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Senigallia, Italy
8 Mar 181655.5Elevated to Cardinal
29 Apr 181655.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
10 Sep 181656.1ResignedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
9 May 182059.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Ecclesiastical Immunity
10 Feb 182160.5AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
28 Sep 182363.1ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
5 Oct 182363.1InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
10 Feb 182968.5DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Annibale Francesco Clemente Melchiore Girolamo Nicola della Genga (VIAF: 88846822)
Pope Annibale Francesco Clemente Melchiore Girolamo Nicola della Genga (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.9 years
  • a cardinal for 7.5 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 342
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Mar 1816
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1794, Number 1
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016