Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefan Bareła

Deceased

Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1916Born
25 Mar 194427.7Ordained PriestPriest of Częstochowa, Poland
26 Oct 196044.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland
26 Oct 196044.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hyllarima
8 Jan 196144.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hyllarima
17 Jan 196447.5AppointedBishop of Częstochowa, Poland
12 Feb 198467.6DiedBishop of Częstochowa, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stefan Bareła (VIAF: 296446723)
Bishop Stefan Bareła (born , died ) Bishop of Częstochowa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZapolice, Diocese of Częstochowa
Ordained PriestSt. Thomas Apostle, Church, Kraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
Ordained BishopHoly Family, Cathedral Basilica, Częstochowa, Diocese of Częstochowa
Death PlaceCzęstochowa, Diocese of Częstochowa
Buried Place (Original)Bishop's Crypt, Holy Family, Cathedral Basilica, Częstochowa, Diocese of Częstochowa

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 15 Jun 2018

Quantcast