Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Danilo Echeverría Verdesoto

Auxiliary Bishop of Quito, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Thibuzabetum

Apostolic Administrator of Tulcán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1962 Born
29 May 198825.9Ordained PriestPriest of Quito, Ecuador
7 Jun 200643.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quito, Ecuador
7 Jun 200643.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibuzabetum
11 Aug 200644.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibuzabetum
8 Jun 202158.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Tulcán, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Vicente Danilo Echeverría Verdesoto
Bishop Vicente Danilo Echeverría Verdesoto (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Quito

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuito, Archdiocese of Quito
Ordained BishopCathedral, Quito, Archdiocese of Quito

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Quito.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c1: Bollettino, 7 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,220
  • fn: CB, 5 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • aadm: CB, 8 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 Aug 2021

Quantcast