Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franco Agostinelli

Bishop Emeritus of Prato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1944 Born
9 Jun 196824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Arezzo, Italy
17 Nov 200157.8AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
6 Jan 200258.0Ordained BishopBishop of Grosseto, Italy
3 Feb 200258.0InstalledBishop of Grosseto, Italy
29 Sep 201268.7AppointedBishop of Prato, Italy
25 Nov 201268.8InstalledBishop of Prato, Italy
15 May 201975.3RetiredBishop of Prato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Franco Agostinelli (VIAF: 253779334)
Bishop Franco Agostinelli (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Prato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArezzo, Diocese of Arezzo
Ordained PriestCathedral, Arezzo, Diocese of Arezzo
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Prato.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,101
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Sep 2012
  • opd/c1/loc/i: AM, 11 Feb 2019
  • r: Bollettino, 15 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 1 Jul 2019

Quantcast