Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Russell Houck

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jackson, Mississippi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1926BornMobile
19 May 195124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Mobile, Alabama, USA
28 Mar 197952.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jackson, Mississippi, USA
28 Mar 197952.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Alexanum
27 May 197952.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alexanum
11 Apr 198457.7AppointedBishop of Jackson, Mississippi, USA
5 Jun 198457.9InstalledBishop of Jackson, Mississippi, USA
3 Jan 200376.5RetiredBishop of Jackson, Mississippi, USA
9 Mar 201689.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Jackson, Mississippi, USA

MicroData Summary for William Russell Houck
Bishop William Russell Houck (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jackson

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 9 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 9 Mar 2016