Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Szkodoń

Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}

Titular Bishop of Turrisblanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1946 BornChyżne
22 Mar 197023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
14 May 198841.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
14 May 198841.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Turrisblanda
4 Jun 198841.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turrisblanda

MicroData Summary for Jan Szkodoń:
Bishop Jan Szkodoń (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,121

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013