Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Okioh

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Natitingou


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1932BornManigri
21 Dec 196331.9Ordained PriestPriest of Natitingou, Benin
11 Nov 198351.8AppointedBishop of Natitingou, Benin
6 Jan 198451.9Ordained BishopBishop of Natitingou, Benin
10 Jun 199563.4ResignedBishop of Natitingou, Benin
15 Apr 200169.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Natitingou, Benin

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Okioh:
Bishop Nicolas Okioh (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Natitingou

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015