Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kazimierz Górny

Bishop Emeritus of Rzeszów


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1937 BornLubien
29 Jun 196022.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
26 Oct 198446.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
26 Oct 198446.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Pertusa
6 Jan 198547.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pertusa
25 Mar 199254.2AppointedBishop of Rzeszów, Poland
14 Jun 201375.4RetiredBishop of Rzeszów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Kazimierz Górny:
Bishop Kazimierz Górny (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Rzeszów

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rzeszów.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015