Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ārvaldis Andrejs Brumanis

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Liepāja


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1926BornKlostere
25 Jul 195428.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 199569.8AppointedBishop of Liepāja, Latvia
6 Jan 199669.9Ordained BishopBishop of Liepāja, Latvia
12 May 200175.2RetiredBishop of Liepāja, Latvia
17 Dec 201387.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Liepāja, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Ārvaldis Andrejs Brumanis:
Bishop Ārvaldis Andrejs Brumanis (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Liepāja

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,645
  • d: CB, 18 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 18 Dec 2013