Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Riccardo Fontana

Bishop of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1947 BornForte dei Marmi
2 Jul 197225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Pisa, Italy
16 Dec 199548.9AppointedArchbishop of Spoleto-Norcia, Italy
6 Jan 199649.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Spoleto-Norcia, Italy
16 Jul 200962.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro, Italy
13 Sep 200962.6InstalledBishop of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Riccardo Fontana:
Archbishop Riccardo Fontana (born ) Bishop of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro

Please contact the Archbishop through the Diocese of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,641

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013