Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio Cortez Lara

Bishop of Tacna y Moquegua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1957 BornChiclayo, Peru
3 Feb 198527.1Ordained PriestPriest of Chiclayo, Peru
18 Mar 200547.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tacna y Moquegua, Peru
4 May 200547.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Tacna y Moquegua, Peru
1 Sep 200648.7SucceededBishop of Tacna y Moquegua, Peru

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Cortez Lara:
Bishop Marco Antonio Cortez Lara (born ) Bishop of Tacna y Moquegua

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tacna y Moquegua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • s: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,880

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013