Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hil Kabashi, O.F.M.

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Southern Albania {Albania Meridionale} (Albanian)

Titular Bishop of Turres in Byzacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1941 Born
18 May 196928.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
3 Dec 199655.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Southern Albania {Albania Meridionale} (Albanian)
3 Dec 199655.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Turres in Byzacena
6 Jan 199755.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turres in Byzacena
15 Jun 201776.3RetiredApostolic Administrator of Southern Albania {Albania Meridionale} (Albanian)

MicroData Summary for Hil Kabashi
Bishop Hil Kabashi O.F.M. (born ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Southern Albania {Albania Meridionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaparac

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Administration of Southern Albania {Albania Meridionale} (Albanian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,884
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Sep 2017