Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juliusz Paetz

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Poznań, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1935Born
28 Jun 195924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
20 Dec 198247.8AppointedBishop of Łomża, Poland
6 Jan 198347.9Ordained BishopBishop of Łomża, Poland
11 Apr 199661.1AppointedArchbishop of Poznań, Poland
28 Mar 200267.1ResignedArchbishop of Poznań, Poland
15 Nov 201984.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Juliusz Paetz (VIAF: 165991656)
Archbishop Juliusz Paetz (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoznań, Archdiocese of Poznań
Ordained PriestSt. Peter and Paul, Cathedral Basilica, Poznań, Archdiocese of Poznań
Death PlacePleszew, Diocese of Kalisz
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Poznań, Archdiocese of Poznań

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 15 Nov 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast