Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gastone Simoni

Bishop Emeritus of Prato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1937 BornCastelfranco di Sopra
1 Jan 196022.7Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 199154.7AppointedBishop of Prato, Italy
6 Jan 199254.7Ordained BishopBishop of Prato, Italy
23 Feb 199254.9InstalledBishop of Prato, Italy
29 Sep 201275.5RetiredBishop of Prato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gastone Simoni:
Bishop Gastone Simoni (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Prato

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Prato.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,556
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Sep 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013