Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marko Sopi

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Prizren, Serbia

Titular Bishop of Celerina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1938Born
29 Jun 196830.3Ordained PriestPriest of Prizren, Serbia
2 Nov 199557.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Skopje-Prizren, Macedonia
2 Nov 199557.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Celerina
6 Jan 199657.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Celerina
24 May 200062.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Prizren, Serbia
11 Jan 200667.8DiedApostolic Administrator of Prizren, Serbia

MicroData Summary for Marko Sopi
Bishop Marko Sopi (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Prizren

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBinac

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,649
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018