Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Pecile

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1922BornSan Vito di Fagagna
11 Jul 194825.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 198361.2AppointedBishop of Terracina-Latina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
6 Jan 198461.2Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina-Latina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
27 Jun 199875.7RetiredBishop of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno, Italy
29 Jun 201188.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Pecile:
Bishop Domenico Pecile (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015