Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro D’Errico

Apostolic Nuncio to Malta

Titular Archbishop of Hyccarum (Hyccara)

Apostolic Nuncio to Libya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1950 Born
24 Mar 197423.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 199847.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hyccarum (Hyccara)
14 Nov 199847.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Pakistan
6 Jan 199948.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hyccarum (Hyccara)
21 Nov 200555.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bosnia-Herzegovina
17 Feb 201059.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Montenegro
21 May 201261.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Croatia
27 Apr 201766.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Malta
10 Jun 201766.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Libya

MicroData Summary for Alessandro D’Errico (VIAF: 305769707)
Archbishop Alessandro D’Errico (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Malta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrattamaggiore, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Malta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2005
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,454
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 May 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Apr 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jun 2017