Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego Causero

Apostolic Nuncio to Switzerland

Titular Archbishop of Gradum

Apostolic Nuncio to Liechtenstein


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1940 BornMoimacco
7 Apr 196323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Udine, Italy
15 Dec 199252.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Meta
15 Dec 199252.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chad
199352.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Central African Republic
199352.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Congo, Republic of
6 Jan 199352.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Meta
199554.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Congo, Republic of
199958.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Central African Republic
31 Mar 199959.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Syria
24 Feb 200161.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gradum
10 Jan 200463.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Czech Republic
28 May 201171.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
28 May 201171.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Liechtenstein

MicroData Summary for Diego Causero:
Archbishop Diego Causero (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Switzerland

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Switzerland.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 May 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,937
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015