Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Michael Milone

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Great Falls-Billings, Montana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1932Born
15 Dec 195725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
10 Nov 198149.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
10 Nov 198149.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Plestia
6 Jan 198249.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Plestia
14 Dec 198755.2AppointedBishop of Great Falls-Billings, Montana, USA
23 Feb 198855.4InstalledBishop of Great Falls-Billings, Montana, USA
12 Jul 200673.8ResignedBishop of Great Falls-Billings, Montana, USA
17 May 201885.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Great Falls-Billings, Montana, USA

MicroData Summary for Anthony Michael Milone (VIAF: 68276130)
Bishop Anthony Michael Milone (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Great Falls-Billings

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOmaha, Diocese of Omaha, Nebraska
Death PlaceOmaha, Archdiocese of Omaha, Nebraska

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Jul 2006
  • d: CB, 17 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 18 May 2018

Quantcast