Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Longin Bednarczyk

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tarnów, Poland

Titular Bishop of Turris Rotunda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1914Born
3 Jun 194430.2Ordained PriestPriest of Tarnów, Poland
21 Feb 196853.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland
21 Feb 196853.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Turris Rotunda
21 Apr 196854.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turris Rotunda
22 Jun 199177.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland
7 Aug 200187.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tarnów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Piotr Longin Bednarczyk
Bishop Piotr Longin Bednarczyk (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tarnów

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimanowa-Sowliny
Death PlaceLimanowa

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • mn/loc: CB, 3 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast