Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luciano Pacomio

Bishop of Mondovi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1941 BornVillanova Monferrato
29 Jun 196523.7Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 199655.1AppointedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
6 Jan 199755.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mondovi, Italy
2 Feb 199755.2InstalledBishop of Mondovi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luciano Pacomio:
Bishop Luciano Pacomio (born ) Bishop of Mondovi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mondovi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,878

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 12 Jul 2014