Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Jerome McCormack

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York

Titular Bishop of Nicives


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1924BornNew York
21 Feb 195935.1Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
23 Dec 198662.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
23 Dec 198662.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicives
6 Jan 198763.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicives
30 Oct 200177.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
23 Nov 201389.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for William Jerome McCormack:
Bishop William Jerome McCormack (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 24 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Nov 2013