Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Patriarchatus Lisbonensis {Ulixbonensis}



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Patriarchate
  • United: 13 December 1740
  • Patriarchal See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Portugal
  • Square Kilometers: 3,735 (1,442 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.patriarcado-lisboa.pt/
  • Mailing Address: Mosteiro de São Vicente de Fora, Campo de Santa Clara, 1100-472 Lisboa, Portugal
  • Telephone: 21.881.05.00
  • Fax: 21.881.05.55

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Lisboa
4th CenturyErectedDiocese of Lisboa (erected)
Archdiocese of Lisboa
10 November 1394ElevatedDiocese of Lisboa Archdiocese of Lisboa
7 November 1716SplitArchdiocese of Lisboa Archdiocese of Eastern Lisboa
Patriarchate of Western Lisboa (and Elevated)
Patriarchate of Western Lisboa
7 November 1716SplitArchdiocese of Lisboa Archdiocese of Eastern Lisboa
Patriarchate of Western Lisboa (and Elevated)
Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
13 December 1740UnitedArchdiocese of Eastern Lisboa
Patriarchate of Western Lisboa
Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
14 September 1956Territory LostPatriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon} (Herdade das Faias, Núcleo das Faias da Colònia Agricola de Pegões, Parte dos Antigos Foros da Herdade de Pegões, Parte da Herdade de Pegões) Archdiocese of Évora
14 September 1956Territory AddedArchdiocese of Évora (Parte da Herdade do Arieiro, Herdade do Espirra, and Posto Sequeiro da Direcção-Geral dos Serviços Agrícolas) Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
25 March 1957Territory LostPatriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon} (Formigais) Diocese of Leiria
16 July 1975Territory LostPatriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon} (Santarem) Diocese of Santarém (erected)
16 July 1975Territory LostDiocese of Beja (Melides/Ponta de Troia (in Grandola))
Archdiocese of Évora (Canha, Pegoês, and Santo Isidro (all in Montijo) and Comporta (in Alcázar do Sal))
Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon} (Setubal)
Diocese of Setúbal (erected)
12 November 1998Territory LostPatriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon} (Seminary of Saint Paul (in Almada) and Christ the King monument) Diocese of Setúbal

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
19501,297,0001,621,40080.0%348924402,9473691,059324ap1951
19702,100,0002,349,99289.4%4852657502,8006512,949358ap1971
19801,950,0002,150,00090.7%3713377082,75415911,471238ap1981
19901,935,5002,227,10086.9%3663096752,867215721,551274ap1991
19991,894,3152,205,07785.9%3222986203,055255181,338284ap2000
20001,894,3152,205,07785.9%3192886073,120314811,350280ap2001
20011,894,3152,205,07785.9%3092916003,157304851,303280ap2002
20021,927,8752,267,39785.0%3072875943,245324631,269281ap2003
20031,927,8752,267,39785.0%3262966223,099384561,262282ap2004
20041,966,7822,313,86185.0%3252715963,299394301,321285ap2005
20111,869,0002,235,00083.6%3302746043,094794131,094288ap2012
20121,870,0002,236,00083.6%3152515663,303843871,092284ap2013
20151,648,8851,924,65085.7%2912525433,036844011,104285ap2016
20181,557,0001,774,70087.7%2902555452,856873891,108285ap2019
20201,496,1301,678,95089.1%2922495412,765903711,091285ap2021
20221,462,0501,617,39090.4%2812505312,753953681,090285ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Lisboa
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 506, and Page 507
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 104, to Page 105
  • Archdiocese of Lisboa
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 259
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 322
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 352
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 397
  • Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 425
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 49, Page 422, and Page 423
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
    Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 27 Nov 2023