Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando de Menezes Coutinho e Vasconcellos

Deceased

Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1480¹Born
26 Aug 151333.6AppointedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
Nov 1513³33.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lamego, Portugal
24 Sep 154060.7AppointedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
7 Jan 156484.0DiedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando de Menezes Coutinho e Vasconcellos
Archbishop Fernando de Menezes Coutinho e Vasconcellos (born 1480, died ) Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Death PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 50.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 322, and Page 217
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1513, Number 12*
  • bd/bp/dp/ob: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • bd/bp/dp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast