Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcos de Lisboa (Betania), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Porto, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1511¹Born
20 Oct 158170.8AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
21 Jan 158271.0Ordained BishopBishop of Porto, Portugal
13 Sep 159180.6DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcos de Lisboa (Betania) (VIAF: 7532692)
Bishop Marcos de Lisboa (Betania) O.F.M. (born 1511, died ) Bishop of Porto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopSão Francisco, Chapel, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 278
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 286
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1582, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast