Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alexeu de Jesu de Meneses, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1559Born
13 Feb 159536.0AppointedArchbishop of Goa, India
26 Mar 159536.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Goa, India
19 Mar 161253.1AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
3 May 161758.2DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Alexeu de Jesu de Meneses (VIAF: 86909386)
Archbishop Alexeu de Jesu de Meneses O.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Braga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopN.D. de Gracia, Augustins, Convent, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Death PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 120, and Page 195
  • c2+: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • bd/bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 204
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1595, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 11 Dec 2017