Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Jesus Maria Cayetano Carvalho, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Castelo Branco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1705³BornLisboa
27 Dec 172722.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
21 Mar 177165.9SelectedBishop of Castelo Branco, Portugal
17 Jun 177166.2ConfirmedBishop of Castelo Branco, Portugal
17 Nov 177166.6Ordained BishopBishop of Castelo Branco, Portugal
13 Jul 178277.2DiedBishop of Castelo Branco, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José de Jesus Maria Cayetano Carvalho:
Bishop José de Jesus Maria Cayetano Carvalho O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Castelo Branco

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,136
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 154

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 14 Dec 2015