Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João de Sousa de Castelo-Branco

Deceased

Bishop of Elvas, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1676Born
19 Dec 169923.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Dec 170226.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jan 171640.0AppointedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
15 Mar 171640.1Ordained BishopBishop of Elvas, Portugal
17 Mar 172852.1DiedBishop of Elvas, Portugal

MicroData Summary for João de Sousa de Castelo-Branco
Bishop João de Sousa de Castelo-Branco (born , died ) Bishop of Elvas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 25.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 195
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,716, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast