Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Braga

Archidioecesis Bracarensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 12th Century
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Portugal
  • Square Kilometers: 2,857 (1,103 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocese-braga.pt/
  • Mailing Address: Rua Sao Domingos 94/B, 4710-435 Braga CODEX, Portugal
  • Telephone: 253.20.31.80
  • Fax: 253.20.31.90

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Braga
4th CenturyErectedDiocese of Braga (erected)
Archdiocese of Braga
12th CenturyElevatedDiocese of Braga Archdiocese of Braga
23 March 1545Territory LostArchdiocese of Braga Diocese of Miranda (do Douro) (erected)
20 April 1922Territory LostDiocese of Bragança e Miranda
Archdiocese of Braga
Diocese of Lamego
Diocese of Vila Real (erected)
3 November 1977Territory LostArchdiocese of Braga Diocese of Viana do Castelo (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Braga
1949806,694807,033100.0%854118972829143848830ap1951
1959895,000895,48099.9%825160985908205820831ap1960
19701,134,9001,135,000100.0%8532011,0541,076404718836ap1971
1980729,000730,00099.9%5761457211,011266924548ap1981
1990927,000930,00099.7%5181266441,4392275761551ap1991
1999881,000900,00097.9%4861135991,4708210790551ap2000
2000882,000900,00098.0%4881105981,4747209778551ap2001
2001882,000900,00098.0%4791085871,5028194754551ap2002
2002927,000945,00098.1%4791125911,5689196747551ap2003
2003944,304964,30497.9%4641195831,6197197747551ap2004
2004945,000965,40097.9%4631075701,6578174662551ap2005
2006875,000952,00091.9%448945421,6148186583551ap2007
2012886,300964,40091.9%3911014921,8018174455552ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Jul 2014