Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Apollinaris de Almeida, S.J. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Patriarch of Ethiopia

Titular Archbishop of Nicaea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1587Born
1623²35.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
22 Mar 162739.6AppointedCoadjutor Patriarch of Ethiopia
22 Mar 162739.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
15 Jun 163850.8DiedCoadjutor Patriarch of Ethiopia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Apollinaris de Almeida
Archbishop Apollinaris de Almeida S.J. (born , died ) Coadjutor Patriarch of Ethiopia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Ordained BishopColégio do Espírito Santo, Évora, Archdiocese of Évora, Portugal

  • a priest for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 257, and Page 71
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,632
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,627, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast