Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diogo Álvares de Brito

Deceased

Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Mar 1406AppointedBishop of Évora, Portugal
25 Feb 1415AppointedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Dec 1422²DiedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diogo Álvares de Brito
Archbishop Diogo Álvares de Brito (died Dec 1422) Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 507, and Page 236
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast