Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingo do Rosario, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1737BornLisbonne, Portugal
20 Jul 176023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
16 Dec 178245.4AppointedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
14 Dec 178346.4Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
178850.4DiedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

MicroData Summary for Domingo do Rosario:
Bishop Domingo do Rosario O.P. (born ) Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

  • a priest for 27.4 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013