Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel de Saldanha

Deceased

Bishop of Viseu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1620¹BornLisboa
22 Dec 167050.9AppointedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
21 Jun 167151.4Ordained BishopBishop of Viseu, Portugal
26 Dec 167151.9DiedBishop of Viseu, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Saldanha
Bishop Manuel de Saldanha (born 1620, died ) Bishop of Viseu

  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,104
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 416
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 371
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 46
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,779

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Feb 2016