Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Mendo Trigoso

Deceased

Bishop of Viseu, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1692³Born
15 Dec 172028.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Dec 172028.9Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 177078.1SelectedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
6 Aug 177078.5ConfirmedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
19 Sep 177886.6DiedBishop of Viseu, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Mendo Trigoso
Bishop Francisco Mendo Trigoso (born , died ) Bishop of Viseu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMatacaes

  • a priest for 57.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 443
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast