Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Alberto de Pinho Moreira Azevedo

Official of the Pontifical Council for Culture

Titular Bishop of Belali


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1953 Born
10 Jul 197723.8Ordained PriestPriest of Porto, Portugal
4 Feb 200551.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
4 Feb 200551.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Belali
2 Apr 200551.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belali
11 Nov 201158.1AppointedOfficial of the Pontifical Council for Culture

MicroData Summary for Carlos Alberto de Pinho Moreira Azevedo
Bishop Carlos Alberto de Pinho Moreira Azevedo (born ) Official of Culture

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilheiros de Poiares

Please contact the Bishop through the Pontifical Council for Culture.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 179, Number 14,844
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast