Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manoel Telles de Brito, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Goa, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹Born
5 Dec 163050.9SelectedArchbishop of Goa, India
10 Feb 163151.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Goa, India
4 Jul 163353.5DiedArchbishop of Goa, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manoel Telles de Brito
Archbishop Manoel Telles de Brito O.P. (born 1580, died ) Archbishop of Goa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 196
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1631, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast