Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Serafim de Sousa Ferreira e Silva

Bishop Emeritus of Leiria-Fátima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1930 BornSanta Maria de Avioso
1 Aug 195424.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 197948.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
30 Apr 197948.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lemellefa
16 Jun 197949.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lemellefa
198150.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
7 May 198756.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Leiria-Fátima, Portugal
2 Feb 199362.6SucceededBishop of Leiria-Fátima, Portugal
22 Apr 200675.8RetiredBishop of Leiria-Fátima, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Serafim de Sousa Ferreira e Silva:
Bishop Serafim de Sousa Ferreira e Silva (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Leiria-Fátima

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Leiria-Fátima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Apr 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013