Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João António Binet Pincio

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lamego


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1748BornLisboa
19 Sep 178436.6Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jun 178638.3SelectedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
24 Jul 178638.4ConfirmedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
15 Oct 178638.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lamego, Portugal
19 Sep 182173.6ResignedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
30 Sep 182779.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Lamego, Portugal

MicroData Summary for João António Binet Pincio
Bishop João António Binet Pincio (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lamego

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 250
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016