Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Maria Souza Prado de Lacerda

Deceased

Bishop of Angra, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1827Born
3 Sep 185427.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Nov 185427.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Feb 188659.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Angra, Portugal
16 Feb 188659.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
4 Apr 188659.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
27 Jan 188962.0SucceededBishop of Angra, Portugal
23 Dec 189164.9DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Francisco Maria Souza Prado de Lacerda
Bishop Francisco Maria Souza Prado de Lacerda (born , died ) Bishop of Angra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAljubarrota, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,103
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 104, and Page 415
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017